EP0119070 - Ethylene-alphaolefin lubricating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIROYAL, INC. 1230 Avenue of the Americas Rockefeller Center New York, New York 10020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | For all designated states UNIROYAL, INC. 1230 Avenue of the Americas Rockefeller Center New York, New York 10020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loveless, Frederick C. 184 Towpath Lane Cheshire New Haven Connecticut 06410 / US | 02 /
Watts, Raymond F. 14 Winchester Drive Califon Hunterdon New Jersey 07830 / US | 03 /
Nudenberg, Walter Route 3 Taunton Lake Road Newton Fairfield Connecticut 06740 / US | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Robert, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Harrison, Michael Robert, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | ||
Former [1988/47] | Alexander, Thomas Bruce Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1984/38] | Harrison, Michael Robert URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301569.4 | 08.03.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | US19830473841 | 09.03.1983 Original published format: US 473841 | US19830531124 | 09.09.1983 Original published format: US 531124 | [1984/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0119070 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0119070 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C10M3/12, C10M3/10, C10M3/20 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
C10M169/04 (EP);
C10M105/32 (EP);
C10M107/02 (EP);
C10M107/04 (EP);
C10M111/04 (EP);
C10M127/04 (EP);
C10M129/10 (EP);
C10M129/42 (EP);
C10M129/95 (EP);
C10M133/04 (EP);
C10M133/46 (EP);
C10M133/52 (EP);
C10M135/10 (EP);
C10M135/30 (EP);
C10M137/10 (EP);
C10M137/12 (EP);
C10M145/14 (EP);
C10M155/02 (EP);
C10M159/16 (EP);
C10M159/22 (EP);
C10M159/24 (EP);
C10M2203/06 (EP);
C10M2203/065 (EP);
C10M2205/00 (EP);
C10M2205/0206 (EP);
C10M2205/0225 (EP);
C10M2205/028 (EP);
C10M2205/0285 (EP);
C10M2205/06 (EP);
C10M2205/063 (EP);
C10M2205/10 (EP);
C10M2205/22 (EP);
C10M2207/023 (EP);
C10M2207/024 (EP);
C10M2207/026 (EP);
C10M2207/027 (EP);
C10M2207/028 (EP);
C10M2207/123 (EP);
C10M2207/127 (EP);
C10M2207/129 (EP);
C10M2207/22 (EP);
C10M2207/262 (EP);
C10M2207/2805 (EP);
C10M2207/281 (EP);
C10M2207/2815 (EP);
C10M2207/282 (EP);
C10M2207/283 (EP);
C10M2207/2835 (EP);
C10M2207/2845 (EP);
C10M2207/286 (EP);
C10M2207/287 (EP);
C10M2207/288 (EP);
C10M2207/289 (EP);
C10M2207/34 (EP);
C10M2207/345 (EP);
C10M2207/40 (EP);
C10M2207/401 (EP);
C10M2207/404 (EP);
C10M2207/4045 (EP);
C10M2209/084 (EP);
C10M2215/02 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/042 (EP);
C10M2215/08 (EP);
C10M2215/082 (EP);
C10M2215/086 (EP);
C10M2215/22 (EP);
C10M2215/221 (EP);
C10M2215/224 (EP);
C10M2215/225 (EP);
C10M2215/226 (EP);
C10M2215/24 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10M2215/30 (EP);
C10M2217/043 (EP);
C10M2217/046 (EP);
C10M2217/06 (EP);
C10M2219/044 (EP);
C10M2219/046 (EP);
C10M2219/087 (EP);
C10M2219/088 (EP);
C10M2219/089 (EP);
C10M2223/045 (EP);
C10M2223/06 (EP);
C10M2223/061 (EP);
C10M2223/065 (EP);
C10M2225/041 (EP);
C10M2229/02 (EP);
C10M2229/04 (EP);
C10M2229/041 (EP);
C10M2229/042 (EP);
C10M2229/043 (EP);
C10M2229/044 (EP);
C10M2229/045 (EP);
C10M2229/046 (EP);
C10M2229/047 (EP);
C10M2229/048 (EP);
C10M2229/05 (EP);
C10M2229/051 (EP);
C10M2229/052 (EP);
C10M2229/053 (EP);
C10M2229/054 (EP);
C10N2010/04 (EP);
C10N2020/01 (EP);
C10N2040/04 (EP);
C10N2040/042 (EP);
C10N2040/044 (EP);
C10N2040/046 (EP);
C10N2040/25 (EP);
C10N2040/251 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C10M111/04, C10M105/32, C10M107/02, C10M107/04 (EP);
C10M169/04, C10M105/32, C10M107/02, C10M107/04, C10M127/04, C10M129/10, C10M129/42, C10M129/95, C10M133/04, C10M133/46, C10M133/52, C10M135/10, C10M135/30, C10M137/10, C10M137/12, C10M145/14, C10M155/02, C10M159/16, C10M159/22, C10M159/24 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | Eine Äthylen-alpha-Olefin-(Oligomer)-Copolymer enthaltende Schmiermittelzusammensetzung | [1984/38] | English: | Ethylene-alphaolefin lubricating composition | [1984/38] | French: | Composition lubrifiante comprenant un copolymère d'éthylène-alphaoléfine | [1984/38] | File destroyed: | 08.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 14.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 26.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/40] | 09.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3634249 (DUPAS ROBERT, et al); | [A]GB1246880 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [XP]EP0088453 (UNIROYAL INC [US]) |