EP0125763 - Medium for electrophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Masashi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co. Ltd. 3-11-46 Senzui Asaka-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Taku c/o Fuji Photo Film Co. Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301846.6 | 19.03.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | JP19830045549 | 18.03.1983 Original published format: JP 4554983 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125763 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125763 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01D57/02, G01N27/26, C08F220/38 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
B01D57/02 (EP,US);
G01N27/44747 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Elektrophoresemedium | [1984/47] | English: | Medium for electrophoresis | [1984/47] | French: | Médium pour l'électrophorèse | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/24] | 05.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1988
25.02.1988
ADMISSIBLE Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US Opponent's representative Brandes, Jürgen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1988
25.02.1988
ADMISSIBLE Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US Opponent's representative Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | 10.03.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.09.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.10.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.10.1989 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2006231 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]DE2656162 | [A] - Z. DEYL "Electrophoresis", part A: techniques, 1979, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY, Amsterdam-Oxford-New York, pages 117-131 | Examination | EP0119090 | EP0119808 |