EP0121381 - Memory identification apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/41] | Memory identification apparatus and method | ||
[1990/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware / US | ||
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states Honeywell Information Systems Inc. 200 Smith Street Waltham Massachusetts 02154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salas, Edward R. 10 Kenmar Dr. Apt. 43 Billerica Massachusetts 02351 / US | 02 /
Fisher, Edwin P. 652 Adams St. N. Abington Massachusetts 02351 / US | 03 /
Boudreau, Daniel A. 82 Wyman Road Billerica Massachusetts 01821 / US | 04 /
Johnson, Robert B. 50 Buckingham Dr. Billerica Massachusetts 01821 / US | 05 /
Nibby, Chester M., Jr. 15 Keys Dr., Apt. 2 Peabody Massachusetts 01960 / US | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301922.5 | 21.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | US19830480964 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: US 480964 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121381 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121381 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121381 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/06 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
G06F12/0653 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F13/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1984/41] | G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/41] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Speicheridentifizierung | [1990/36] | English: | Memory identification apparatus | [1990/36] | French: | Appareil d'identification de mémoire | [1990/36] |
Former [1984/41] | Gerät und Verfahren zur Speicheridentifizierung | ||
Former [1984/41] | Memory identification apparatus and method | ||
Former [1984/41] | Appareil et méthode d'identification de mémoire | Examination procedure | 31.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3813652 (ELMER B, et al); | [X]US4281392 (GRANTS VALDIS, et al); | [AD]US4296467 (NIBBY JR CHESTER M, et al); | [AD]US4303993 (PANEPINTO JR WILLIAM, et al) |