EP0124252 - Double ester of 16beta-ethylestran-17beta-ol derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1984/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimura, Yoshinobu C-601, 19 Mihogaoka Ibaraki Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
Nishida, Yoko 3-14, Nakatsu-cho Ibaraki Osaka 567 / JP | 03 /
Yashiki, Takatsuka 20-18, Izumigaoka Takarazuka Hyogo 665 / JP | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302076.9 | 27.03.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | JP19830057227 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: JP 5722783 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0124252 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0124252 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07J1/00, C07J41/00, A61K31/565 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
C07J41/0044 (EP,US);
C07J1/0074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/45] | Title | German: | Zweifähige Estern von 16-beta Ethyl 17-beta-Hydroxy-Estranderivaten | [1984/45] | English: | Double ester of 16beta-ethylestran-17beta-ol derivatives | [1984/45] | French: | Esters doubles de dérivés de 16-bêta éthyl 17-bêta-hydroxy estranes | [1984/45] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 15.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0003794 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0044495 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [Y]US3856829 (GOTO G, et al) |