EP0123456 - A combined intraframe and interframe transform coding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/44] | A combined intraframe and interframe transform coding system | ||
[1990/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPRESSION LABS, INC. 2305 Bering Drive San Jose California 95131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states COMPRESSION LABS, INC. 2305 Bering Drive San Jose California 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Wen-Hsiung 668 Inverness Way Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | 02 /
Elliott, James Parker 22126 Clearcreek Court Cupertino California 95014 / US | 03 /
Newell, Robert Edwin George 3711 Thousand Oaks Drive San Jose California 950136 / US | 04 /
Nichols, Ralph Emerson 15970 Longwood Drive Los Gatos California 95030 / US | 05 /
Rackett, Albert Edwards 2964 Warburton Avenue Santa Clara California 95051 / US | [1990/50] |
Former [1984/46] | 01 /
Chen, Wen-Hsiung 668 Inverness Way Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | ||
02 /
Elliott, James Parker 22126 Clearcreek Court Cupertino California 95014 / US | |||
03 /
Newell, Robert Edwin George 3711 Thousand Oaks Drive San Jose California 950136 / US | |||
04 /
Nichols, Ralph Emerson 15970 Longwood Drive Los Gatos California 95030 / US | |||
05 /
Rackett, Albert Edwards 2964 Warburton Avenue Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | |||
Former [1984/44] | 01 /
Chen, Wen-Hsiung 668 Inverness Way Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | ||
02 /
Elliott, James Parker 22126 Clearcreek Court Cupertino California 95014 / US | |||
03 /
Newell, Robert Edwin George 3711 Thousand Oaks Drive San Jose California 950136 / US | |||
04 /
Nichols, Ralph Emerson 15970 Longwood Drive Los Gatos California 95030 / US | |||
05 /
Rackett, Albert Edwards 1066 Lily Avenue Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302109.8 | 28.03.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | US19830479766 | 28.03.1983 Original published format: US 479766 | [1984/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0123456 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0123456 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123456 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/12 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
G02B5/18 (EP);
A63B21/00185 (EP);
H04N19/115 (EP);
H04N19/14 (EP);
H04N19/152 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/18 (EP);
H04N19/60 (EP);
H04N19/619 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
A63B2022/0038 (EP);
H04N19/124 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/44] | Title | German: | Methode für kombinierte Intra- und Interbild-Transformationskodierung | [1990/50] | English: | A combined intraframe and interframe transform coding method | [1990/50] | French: | Méthode de transformation-codage intratrame et intertrame combinée | [1990/50] |
Former [1984/44] | Kombiniertes Intra- und Interbild-Transformationskodierungssystem | ||
Former [1984/44] | A combined intraframe and interframe transform coding system | ||
Former [1984/44] | Système de transformation-codage intratrame et intertrame combinée | Examination procedure | 14.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 09.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0084270 (COMPRESSION LABS INC [US]); | [AD]US4302775 (WIDERGREN ROBERT D, et al) | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS COMMUNICATIONS, vol. Com-25, no. 11, November 1977, pages 1329-1339; J.A. ROESE et al. "Interframe cosine transform image coding" |