Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] |
05.08.1987 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] |
24.01.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.03.1987 [1987/11] |
10.07.1985 | Change - representative | published on 11.09.1985 [1985/37] |
28.02.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.05.1985 [1985/18] |
14.09.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.11.1984 [1984/46] |