EP0122160 - Composition suitable for inert electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA 1501 Alcoa Building Mellon Square Pittsburgh, PA 15219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA 1501 Alcoa Building Mellon Square Pittsburgh, PA 15219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ray, Siba P. 301 Oak Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania / US | 02 /
Rapp, Robert A. 1379 Southport Drive Columbus Ohio / US | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84302475.3 | 11.04.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | US19830483693 | 11.04.1983 Original published format: US 483693 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0122160 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0122160 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/12, C25C7/02 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
C25C7/025 (EP,US);
C25C3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Für inerte Elektrode geeignete Zusammensetzung | [1984/42] | English: | Composition suitable for inert electrode | [1984/42] | French: | Composition appropriée pour électrode inerte | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 17.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/01] | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0111921 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]); | [XP]FR2533591 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]); | [Y]WO8102027 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US], et al); | [Y]GB2088902 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA) |