EP0124362 - Continuous casting mold oscillator load indicating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USS ENGINEERS AND CONSULTANTS, INC. 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states USS ENGINEERS AND CONSULTANTS, INC. 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ives, Kenneth Duaine 1207 Meadow Glenn Drive Valparaiso Indiana 46383 / US | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302843.2 | 27.04.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | US19830489619 | 28.04.1983 Original published format: US 489619 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0124362 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0124362 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/04, B22D11/16 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
B22D11/20 (EP,US);
B22D11/04 (KR);
B22D11/053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/45] | Title | German: | System zur Anzeige der Belastung der Oszillationseinrichtung einer Stranggiesskokille | [1984/45] | English: | Continuous casting mold oscillator load indicating system | [1984/45] | French: | Système d'indication de la charge d'une installation d'oscillations d'une lingotière à coulée continue | [1984/45] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57149054 ; | [A]GB907202 (HEAD WRIGHTSON & CO LTD); | [AD]GB1556616 (BRITISH STEEL CORP); | [A]GB1556615 (BRITISH STEEL CORP); | [A]GB2068803 (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]DE3017906 (VNII AVTOMATIZACII CERNOJ META [SU]); | [AD]EP0044291 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 253 (M-178)(1131), December 11, 1982; & JP - A - 57 149054 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 14-09-1982, & JP57149054 A 00000000 |