EP0124379 - Hydroquinone derivatives and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1987 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1984/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imada, Isuke 18-10, Tsuruyamadai 4-chome Izumi Osaka 594 / JP | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302923.2 | 01.05.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | JP19830077819 | 02.05.1983 Original published format: JP 7781983 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0124379 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0124379 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C141/16, C07C139/00 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
C07C305/24 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/45] | Title | German: | Hydrochinonabkömmlinge, sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1984/45] | English: | Hydroquinone derivatives and production thereof | [1984/45] | French: | Dérivés d'hydroquinone et procédé pour leur production | [1984/45] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 30.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |