EP0125093 - Diaz(ep)ine bis(N-amidinoamidine) derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1988 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1984/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eakin, Murdoch Allan 2 Cockhall Lane Langley Macclesfield Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Gunn, Donald Murray 16 Merlin Park Dollar Clackmannan Scotland FK14 7BZ / GB | 03 /
Pemberton, Denis 9 Eskdale Avenue Bramhall Stockport Cheshire / GB | [1984/46] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, John David, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/46] | Atkinson, John David, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302929.9 | 01.05.1984 | [1984/46] | Priority number, date | GB19830012660 | 09.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8312660 | [1984/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125093 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/20, C07D243/04, A61K31/50, A61K31/55 | [1984/46] | CPC: |
C07D295/215 (EP);
A01N47/44 (EP);
A61K8/43 (EP);
A61K8/494 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP);
C07D243/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/46] | Title | German: | Diaz(ep)in bis-(N-Amidinoamidin)-Derivate | [1984/46] | English: | Diaz(ep)ine bis(N-amidinoamidine) derivatives | [1984/46] | French: | Dérivés de diaz(ép)ine bis-(N-amidinoamidine) | [1984/46] | File destroyed: | 08.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 10.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 26.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/06] | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1795443 (ASPRO NICHOLAS LTD) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 11, 1968, page 942, Washington, US; J.W. JAMES et al.: "The synthesis of some heterocyclic derivatives of biguanide with antibacterial activity" |