EP0127944 - A plant growth regulating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izumi, Kazuo 14-7, Mefu-2-chome Takarazuka-shi / JP | 02 /
Oshio, Hiromichi 14-12, Tokiwadai-6-chome Toyonocho Toyonogun Osaku-fu / JP | [1984/50] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302936.4 | 01.05.1984 | [1984/50] | Priority number, date | JP19830077817 | 02.05.1983 Original published format: JP 7781783 | [1984/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127944 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127944 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/12, A01N43/64, // (A01N57/12, 43:64, 43:40, 33:12),(A01N43/64, 43:40, 33:12) | [1984/50] | CPC: |
A01N43/653 (EP);
A01N43/64 (KR);
A01N57/22 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/653, A01N33/12 (EP);
A01N43/653, A01N43/40, A01N33/12 (EP);
A01N57/20, A01N43/653, A01N43/40, A01N33/12 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/50] | Title | German: | Pflanzenwachstumsregulierende Zusammensetzung | [1984/50] | English: | A plant growth regulating composition | [1984/50] | French: | Composition régulatrice de la croissance des plantes | [1984/50] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 10.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/43] | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/43] | Divisional application(s) | EP88103293.2 / EP0287787 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0057357 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]GB2081700 (ICI LTD); | [Y]DE3045182 (BAYER AG [DE]) |