EP0126585 - Pyrotechnic or explosive device having electric ignition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haley & Weller Limited Wilne Mill Draycott Derbyshire DE7 3QJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states Haley & Weller Limited Wilne Mill Draycott Derbyshire DE7 3QJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Geoffrey Maurice 86 Edgware Road Bulwell Nottingham / GB | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/46] | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | ||
Former [1984/48] | Loven, Keith James Eric Potter & Clarkson 14 Oxford Street Nottingham NG1 5BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303116.2 | 09.05.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | GB19830013572 | 18.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8313572 | [1984/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0126585 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0126585 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126585 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F42C15/02, F42C11/00 | [1984/48] | CPC: |
F42C11/06 (EP,US);
F42C11/003 (EP,US);
F42C14/025 (EP,US);
F42C9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/48] | Title | German: | Mit einem elektrischen Zündsystem versehene pyrotechnische oder explosive Ladung | [1984/48] | English: | Pyrotechnic or explosive device having electric ignition | [1984/48] | French: | Dispositif pyrotechnique ou explosif muni d'un système d'allumage électrique | [1984/48] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 24.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2015366 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]FR2483068 (RUGGIERI ETS [FR]); | [A]FR1292384 (SOC TECH DE RECH IND); | [A]FR2116783 (CLAUSIN PIERRE); | [A]FR2339155 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]) |