EP0125892 - Islets-activating protein derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nogimori, Katsumi 7-7-6 Oe, Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Tamura, Makoto 7-3-17 Oe, Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 03 /
Kurokawa, Shigeki 3-28-8 Seta Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 04 /
Yajima, Motoyuki 9-406 Jyutaku-Kohdan 2-3 Ohira Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303169.1 | 10.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | JP19830082363 | 11.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8236383 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125892 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125892 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125892 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/00, C12P21/00, A61K37/02, A61K39/10 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
C07K14/235 (EP,US);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/825 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/47] | C07G7/00, C12P21/00, A61K37/02, A61K39/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/47] | Title | German: | Derivate des Inseln aktivierenden Proteins | [1984/47] | English: | Islets-activating protein derivatives | [1984/47] | French: | Dérivés de protéine activateurs d'îlots | [1984/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 09.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2378793 (KAKENYAKU KAKO KK [JP]); | [A]FR2393809 (KAKENYAKU KAKO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0047802 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) | Examination | JPS55129295 |