EP0125911 - Process for production of olefin polymer or copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kioka, Mamoru 3-6, Misono 1-chome Ohtake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Kashiwa, Norio 2-9, Muronoki-cho 1-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1984/47] | Application number, filing date | 84303228.5 | 11.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | JP19830082139 | 11.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8213983 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125911 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125911 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/64 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6543 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6583 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von olefinen Homo- und Copolymeren | [1984/47] | English: | Process for production of olefin polymer or copolymer | [1984/47] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de polymères et copolymères d'oléfines | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 07.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0022675 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP0045977 |