EP0127366 - Method of die casting a piston [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIBBS DIE CASTING ALUMINUM CORPORATION 369 Community Drive Henderson, KY 42420-0032 / US | [1984/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindsey, John L. 202 Shenandoah Place Henderson Kentucky 42420 / US | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Joseph Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [1985/27] |
Former [1984/49] | Blatchford, William Charles WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303241.8 | 14.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | US19830499611 | 31.05.1983 Original published format: US 499611 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127366 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B22D15/02, B22D27/15, B22D27/11 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
B22D15/02 (EP);
B22D27/11 (EP);
B22D27/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/49] | Title | German: | Giessverfahren für Kolben | [1984/49] | English: | Method of die casting a piston | [1984/49] | French: | Procédé pour couler un piston | [1984/49] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/07] | 04.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3068539 ; | [AD]US3268960 ; | [A]US2057074 |