EP0127371 - 1,N-diaryl-4,5-dihydro-1H-pyrazol-3-amines, compositions containing them and methods for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burford, Sidney Clifford 51 Kirkstone Drive Loughborough Leicestershire / GB | 02 /
Hardern, David Norman 6 Charnwood Fields Sutton Bonington Loughborough Leicestershire / GB | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Craig, Christopher Bradberry, et al Fisons plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | Craig, Christopher Bradberry, et al Fisons plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303262.4 | 15.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | GB19830014111 | 21.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8314111 | GB19830034283 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: GB 8334283 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127371 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127371 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127371 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/06, C07D401/12, C07D401/04, A61K31/415 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
C07D231/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1990/41] |
Former [1984/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | 1,N-Diaryl-4,5-dihydro-1H-pyrazol-3-amine, diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1984/49] | English: | 1,N-diaryl-4,5-dihydro-1H-pyrazol-3-amines, compositions containing them and methods for their preparation | [1984/49] | French: | 1,N-Diaryl-4,5-dihydro-1H-pyrazol-3-amines, compositions les contenant et leurs procédés de préparation | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 18.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/46] | Request for further processing for: | 07.04.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0055418 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [AD]EP0022578 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [E]EP0119450 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [E]EP0119449 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) | Examination | - J. March, "Advanced Organic Chemistry" | - "The Chemistry of the Amino Group", Ed. Saul Patah/J Wiley 1960 |