EP0130682 - Treatment of fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.1989 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joh. A. Benckiser GmbH Postfach 21 10 67, Ludwig-Bertram-Strasse 8 + 10 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states Joh. A. Benckiser GmbH Postfach 21 10 67, Ludwig-Bertram-Strasse 8 + 10 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center Saint Paul Minnesota 55102 / US | ||
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states ECONOMICS LABORATORY, INC. 370 Wabasha Avenue Osborn Building Saint Paul, MN 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Majewski, Donna M. 1039 Evergreen Trail Lino Lakes Minnesota 55014 / US | 02 /
Morganson, Stephen A. 831 23rd Ave, N. S. St. Paul Minnesota 55075 / US | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Grussdorf, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1988/08] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/02] | Bond, Bentley George HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303416.6 | 21.05.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | US19830510943 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: US 510943 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130682 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130682 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/46, D06M11/12, D06M15/53, C11D17/04 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
C11D17/047 (EP,US);
C11D3/124 (EP,US);
D06F58/203 (EP,US);
D06M11/79 (EP,US);
D06M13/165 (EP,US);
D06M13/463 (EP,US);
D06M15/53 (EP,US);
D06M23/02 (EP,US);
D06M2200/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Textilmaterialien | [1985/02] | English: | Treatment of fabric | [1985/02] | French: | Traitement de matières textiles | [1985/02] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 09.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4149977 (MORGANSON STEPHEN A, et al); | [X]EP0002857 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |