Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0130682
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.07.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
04.09.1989 |
Change - withdrawal |
published on 25.10.1989 [1989/43] |
23.08.1989 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 11.10.1989 [1989/41] |
14.02.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] |
04.08.1988 |
First examination report |
|
04.05.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] |
18.03.1988 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] |
08.01.1988 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.02.1988 [1988/08] |
08.01.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.02.1988 [1988/08] |
01.10.1987 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] |
02.03.1987 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.04.1987 [1987/17] |
20.02.1987 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] |
10.11.1984 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.01.1985 [1985/02] |