Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0129981 | Global Dossier | 26.09.1990 | B1 | EP0129981 | 14.01.1987 | A3 | EP0129981 | 02.01.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP8995383 | 24.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1244092 | 01.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8995383 | 24.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3483283D1 | 31.10.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP8995383 | 24.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0347093B | 18.07.1991 | B2 | JPS59216282 | 06.12.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8995383 | 24.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4633884 | 06.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8995383 | 24.05.1983 |