EP0129981 - Physiological signals processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISYA ADVANCE 5-7, Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISYA ADVANCE 5-7, Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | ||
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISYA ADVANCE KAIHATSU KENKYUJO 5-7 Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imai, Hideki Yokohama Park Town J-902, 3-76-3 Mutsugawa Minami-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Minoru 9-105 Myojindai Hodogaya-ku Yokahama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1985/01] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1988/24] | Ellis, John Clifford Holgate MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | ||
Former [1985/01] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303460.4 | 22.05.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | JP19830089953 | 24.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8995383 | [1985/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129981 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129981 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129981 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/349 (EP,US);
A61B5/7232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/01] | Title | German: | Verarbeitungssystem von physiologischen Signalen | [1985/01] | English: | Physiological signals processing system | [1985/01] | French: | Système processeur de signaux physiologiques | [1985/01] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 13.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1803499 (IBM) | [A] - BIOMEDIZINISCHE TECHNIK, vol. 25, no. 1/2, January/February 1980, pages 2-6, Berlin, DE; W. KRAFT et al.: "EKG-Datenreduktion mittels eines Mikrocomputers" |