EP0127426 - Percutaneous pharmaceutical compositions for external use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1984/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uda, Yoshiaki 2-501, 3 Nikawadanchi Takarazuka Hyogo 665 / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Masayuki 11-6, Daiwanishi 2-chome Kawanishi Hyogo 666-01 / JP | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303461.2 | 22.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | JP19830091239 | 23.05.1983 Original published format: JP 9123983 | JP19840056922 | 23.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5692284 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127426 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A61K37/02 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K38/04 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K47/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/04, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/04, A61K31/20, A61K31/45, A61K31/16, A61K31/13 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Perkutane pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen zur äusserlichen Anwendung | [1984/49] | English: | Percutaneous pharmaceutical compositions for external use | [1984/49] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques percutanées pour application externe | [1984/49] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/10] | 13.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2427100 ; | [E]EP0103783 ; | [XP]EP0086092 ; | [A]GB2015339 |