Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] |
28.11.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] |
18.07.1986 | First examination report | |
05.10.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.12.1984 [1984/49] |
05.10.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.12.1984 [1984/49] |