Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE32007T | 15.01.1988 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP84303529 | 24.05.1984 | JP9069783 | 25.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU569742B | Global Dossier | 18.02.1988 | B2 | AU2840784 | 29.11.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9069783 | 25.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0127451 | Global Dossier | 13.01.1988 | B1 | EP0127451 | 05.12.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9069783 | 25.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1214262 | 18.11.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9069783 | 25.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3468804D1 | 18.02.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9069783 | 25.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS59216380 | 06.12.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9069783 | 25.05.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4609944 | 02.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9069783 | 25.05.1983 |