EP0127451 - Automatic focus control system for video camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakada, Yasuo c/o Sony Corp. 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kato, Yukihiro c/o Sony Corp. 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303529.6 | 24.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | JP19830090697 | 25.05.1983 Original published format: JP 9069783 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127451 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127451 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, G03B3/10 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
G02B7/38 (EP,US);
H04N23/671 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/49] | H04N5/26, G03B3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/49] | Title | German: | Automatisches Fokussierungssteuersystem für eine Videokamera | [1984/49] | English: | Automatic focus control system for video camera | [1984/49] | French: | Système de contrôle automatique de focalisation pour caméra de télévision | [1984/49] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 22.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4297014 (NAKAMURA KAZUO, et al); | [A]FR2494858 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS [JP]); | [A]US4344679 (YAGI MICHIO, et al) |