EP0127480 - Simultaneous NMR imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macovski, Albert 2505 Alpine Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states Macovski, Albert 2505 Alpine Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1988/23] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | ||
Former [1984/49] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303613.8 | 29.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | US19830499218 | 31.05.1983 Original published format: US 499218 | US19840603333 | 24.04.1984 Original published format: US 603333 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127480 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127480 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127480 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
G01R33/482 (EP,US);
G01N24/00 (KR);
G01R33/56 (EP,US);
G01R33/3621 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugung in Echtzeit mittels magnetischer Kernresonanz | [1984/49] | English: | Simultaneous NMR imaging system | [1984/49] | French: | Production d'images en temps réel par résonance magnétique nucléaire | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/40] | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1989 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2822953 (NAT RES DEV); | [X]EP0021535 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0024640 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]GB1596160 (NAT RES DEV) | [X] - APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 22, 1980, pages 257-271, Springer-Verlag 1980, Heidelberg, DE; L.F. FEINER et al.: "On NMR spin imaging by magnetic field modulation" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, vol.NS-27, no. 3, June 1980, pages 1232-1238, IEEE, New York, US; E.R. ANDREW: "Nuclear magnetic resonance imaging: the multiple sensitive point method" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 47, no. 8, August 1976, pages 3709-3721, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; W.S. HINSHAW: "Image formation by nuclear magnetic resonance: the sensitive-point method" |