EP0128001 - Process for preparing alkylbenzenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1987 [1987/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, 1-chome Nishi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, 1-chome Nishi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudoh, Michio 155-72, Honmoku Osato-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsuno, Mitsuo 2-228, Kosugi-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Imai, Hirosuke 1393-3, Hakusan-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1984/50] | Representative(s) | Webb, Frederick Ronald G.F. Redfern & Co. Marlborough Lodge 14 Farncombe Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 2BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Webb, Frederick Ronald G.F. Redfern & Co. Marlborough Lodge 14 Farncombe Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 2BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303621.1 | 30.05.1984 | [1984/50] | Priority number, date | JP19830096756 | 31.05.1983 Original published format: JP 9675683 | [1984/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0128001 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0128001 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128001 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C15/02, C07C2/72, B01J23/04 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
B01J23/04 (EP,US);
C07C2/72 (EP,US);
C07C2521/04 (EP,US);
C07C2523/04 (EP,US);
C07C2527/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/72, C07C15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkylbenzolen | [1984/50] | English: | Process for preparing alkylbenzenes | [1984/50] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'alkylbenzènes | [1984/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 12.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1259535 ; | [A]US3355484 (BLOCH HERMAN S) |