|
23.05.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1992 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.1992 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.01.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1992 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.01.1992 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.06.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1991 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.05.1991 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.07.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1989 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1989 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.09.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.08.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.04.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.02.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.09.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.07.1986 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |