Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.08.1992 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] |
18.05.1990 | Opposition filed | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] |
24.06.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] |
02.09.1986 | Change - first examination report | published on 22.10.1986 [1986/43] |
07.04.1986 | First examination report | |
18.12.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.02.1985 [1985/08] |
20.10.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.12.1984 [1984/51] |