EP0128758 - Improvements in vehicle disc brakes of the liquid cooled type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1992 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Roy The Corner House 1 Marlbrook Lane Licky Rock Bromsgrove Worcestershire / GB | 02 /
Gornall, Graham John 17 Sadler Road Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 6HX / GB | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303885.2 | 08.06.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | GB19830016025 | 11.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8316025 | GB19830016548 | 17.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8316548 | GB19830029159 | 01.11.1983 Original published format: GB 8329159 | [1984/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128758 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128758 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0128758 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/853, F16D65/12, F16D55/14 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
F16D55/14 (EP);
F16D65/127 (EP);
F16D65/853 (EP);
F16D2069/004 (EP);
F16D2125/36 (EP);
F16D65/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1984/51] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitgekühlte Fahrzeugscheibenbremsen | [1984/51] | English: | Improvements in vehicle disc brakes of the liquid cooled type | [1984/51] | French: | Freins à disque de véhicules du type à refroidissement par liquide | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 09.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.1990
30.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE Borg-Warner Automotive GmbH Kurpfalzring D-6900 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer-Roedern, Giso Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.1990
30.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE Borg-Warner Automotive GmbH Kurpfalzring D-6900 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Meyer-Roedern, Giso, Dr. Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | 23.05.1990 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 28.05.1990 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 12.06.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.09.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.01.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.02.1992 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.03.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.07.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB739244 ; | [A]FR1318579 ; | [A]US3185257 ; | [A]GB916856 |