EP0130014 - Bitumenous compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1991 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jevanoff, Andre 8 Avenue Wolfers B-1310 La Hulpe / BE | 02 /
Verrier, Pierre Eugene Michel Avenue du Vivier d'Oie 63 B-1180 Brussels / BE | [1985/01] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1985/01] | Dew, Melvyn John Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304029.6 | 14.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | GB19830017541 | 28.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8317541 | [1985/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130014 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130014 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0130014 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08L23/02, C08L23/06, C08L23/16, C08L101/00, C08K3/00, C08K5/00 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,KR);
C08L23/02 (KR);
C08L23/06 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Bituminöse Zusammensetzungen | [1985/01] | English: | Bitumenous compositions | [1985/01] | French: | Compositions bitumineuses | [1985/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 03.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.1987
09.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | 02
10.05.1988
09.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche BP Aktiengesellschaft Überseering 2 D-22297 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.1987
09.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | ||
02
10.05.1988
09.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche BP Aktiengesellschaft Überseering 2 D-22297 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 D-20148 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1988/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.1987
09.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | 08.07.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.03.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.01.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.04.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.10.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CS201714 ; | [A]FR2288126 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]GB1315968 (BRIGGS AMASCO LTD); | [A]US3790519 (WAHLBORG H); | [A]EP0009432 (CIB COMPOS IND BATIMENT [FR]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, 1983, page 77, no. 162279y, Columbus, Ohio, US; & CS-A-201714 (MILAN PODESVA et al.) 15-08-1982, & CS201714 A 00000000 |