EP0130075 - Space heating apparatus and valve assemblies therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYVENTIONS S.A. Würth Treuhand Badenerstrasse 156 8036 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states POLYVENTIONS S.A. Würth Treuhand Badenerstrasse 156 CH-8036 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brehmer, Roland Torgvagen 28 Fellingsbro / SE | [1985/01] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304282.1 | 25.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | GB19830017445 | 28.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8317445 | GB19830021990 | 16.08.1983 Original published format: GB 8321990 | GB19830025311 | 21.09.1983 Original published format: GB 8325311 | [1985/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130075 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130075 | Date: | 06.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/12 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
F24D19/0009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Heizgeräte und Ventilanordnung dafür | [1985/01] | English: | Space heating apparatus and valve assemblies therefor | [1985/01] | French: | Appareil de chauffage et ensemble de valves pour un tel appareil | [1985/01] | File destroyed: | 27.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 17.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/17] | 24.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2307056 |