EP0132310 - Circuit arrangement for removing noise of a colour video signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.1989 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/05] | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagaki, Shintaro Shonan Raifu-taun Komayori-danchi 14-402, 5450, Ooba Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuriyama, Takashi 7-5-2, Toshima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/05] | Representative(s) | Hartley, David, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | [1985/05] | Application number, filing date | 84304283.9 | 25.06.1984 | [1985/05] | Priority number, date | JP19830113859 | 24.06.1983 Original published format: JP 11385983 | [1985/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132310 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132310 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64 | [1985/05] | CPC: |
H04N9/77 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/646 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/68 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/05] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Rauschentfernung bei Farbvideosignal | [1985/05] | English: | Circuit arrangement for removing noise of a colour video signal | [1985/05] | French: | Aménagement de circuit pour supprimer le bruit d'un signal vidéo couleur | [1985/05] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 18.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3780215 (SHIBATA A, et al) |