EP0130809 - Method of preparing highly siliceous porous crystalline zeolites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax Virginia 22037-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US | ||
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Pochen 1173 Ollerton Road West Deptford N.J. 08066 / US | 02 /
Dwyer, Francis Gerard 1128 Talleyrand Road West Chester Pa. 19380 / US | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1988/19] | Davy, John Raymond CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1985/02] | Grundy, Derek George Ritchie CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304434.8 | 28.06.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | US19830509671 | 30.06.1983 Original published format: US 509671 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130809 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130809 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130809 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/34, B01J29/28 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
B01J29/40 (EP);
C01B37/02 (EP);
C01B39/04 (EP);
C01B39/40 (EP);
B01J29/65 (EP);
B01J29/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/02] | C01B33/28, B01J29/28 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von kieselsäurereichen porösen kristallinen Zeolithen | [1985/02] | English: | Method of preparing highly siliceous porous crystalline zeolites | [1985/02] | French: | Procédé pour la production de zéolites cristallines poreuses et à haut contenu en silice | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 11.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0077624 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0030751 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]DE2909929 (BASF AG); | [A]EP0002900 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO [GB]); | [AD]US4151189 (PLANK CHARLES J [US], et al) |