EP0130826 - Hydraulic dampers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOUTH AFRICAN INVENTIONS DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION Administration Building Council for Scientific and Industrial Research Scientia Meiringnaude Road Pretoria Transvaal / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states SOUTH AFRICAN INVENTIONS DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION Administration Building Council for Scientific and Industrial Research Scientia Meiringnaude Road Pretoria Transvaal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheffel, Herbert 83A Van Wouw Street Groenkloof Pretoria / ZA | 02 /
Tournay, Harry Marshall 123 Limpopo Avenue Lyttleton Manor Verwoerdburg / ZA | 03 /
Erwee, Andries Paul 785 Berg Avenue Florwina Pretoria / ZA | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Roy Alfred, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [1985/02] | Application number, filing date | 84304494.2 | 29.06.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | ZA19830004896 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: ZA 834896 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130826 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/10, B61F5/30 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
F16F9/16 (EP);
F16F2230/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Dämpfer | [1985/02] | English: | Hydraulic dampers | [1985/02] | French: | Amortisseurs hydrauliques | [1985/02] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/11] | 12.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2935935 (BOGE GMBH); | [X]GB1175255 (NUCLEAR POWER GROUP LTD); | [X]DE1955344 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES); | [X]DE1072018 ; | [X]FR2333168 (WESER AG [DE]); | [X]GB797530 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD); | [X]FR642711 ; | [A]EP0015378 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [A]GB2027160 (SECOH GIKEN KK); | [A]US3002741 (FRANK AKUTOWICZ); | [A]US2930455 (WILLIAMS RAY S); | [A]US2032659 (CARL HUSSMAN) |