EP0131467 - Borax dispersion milling of quinacridones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ganci, James Barry 2213 Nassau Drive Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | [1985/03] | Application number, filing date | 84304699.6 | 10.07.1984 | [1985/03] | Priority number, date | US19830512687 | 11.07.1983 Original published format: US 512687 | [1985/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131467 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131467 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131467 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/04, C09B67/10, C09B48/00 | [1985/03] | CPC: |
C09B67/0002 (EP,US);
C09B48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/03] | Title | German: | Borax-Dispersionsmahlen von Chinacridonen | [1985/03] | English: | Borax dispersion milling of quinacridones | [1985/03] | French: | Broyage de quinacridones en dispersion avec du borax | [1985/03] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 18.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1051762 ; | [A]GB1240278 (COLUMBIAN CARBON [US]); | [AD]US2816114 (FREDERICK EHRICH FELIX, et al); | [AD]US3657248 (WAGENER ANTHONY P); | [A]US4287000 (BUCKWALTER GEOFFREY R) |