EP0132121 - Batter mixer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEIN ASSOCIATES, INC. 1622 First Street Sandusky Ohio 44870 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states STEIN ASSOCIATES, INC. 1622 First Street Sandusky Ohio 44870 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Michael E. 207 Madden Street Bellevue Ohio 44811 / US | 02 /
Fetzer, Fred 16817 Albion Road Strongsville Ohio 44136 / US | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304749.9 | 11.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | US19830514014 | 15.07.1983 Original published format: US 514014 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132121 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132121 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A21C1/02 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
A21C1/02 (EP,US);
A21C1/1435 (EP,US);
A21C1/148 (EP,US);
A47J43/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1985/04] | Title | German: | Teigmischmaschine | [1985/04] | English: | Batter mixer | [1985/04] | French: | Mélangeur à pâte | [1985/04] | File destroyed: | 27.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/42] | 23.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.11.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2846200 (JAMISON FREDERICK W); | [A]US4259022 (FOLLAND ROY E); | [A]US3995839 (ZINGG WARREN M); | [A]US3507420 (NELSON NELS R, et al); | [A]FR2481828 (BEATRICE FOODS CO [US]); | [A]GB859851 (RENE TRUBERT); | [A]DE2723894 (COMPUR ELECTRONIC GMBH) |