EP0132415 - Printing system for a dot printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1989 [1989/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/05] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takano, Hirokuni c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Tadao c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Izaki, Osamu c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co. Ltd 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/05] | Representative(s) | Corin, Christopher John, et al Mathisen Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/05] | Corin, Christopher John, et al Mathisen Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305069.1 | 25.07.1984 | [1985/05] | Priority number, date | JP19830135228 | 26.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13522883 | JP19830173163 | 21.09.1983 Original published format: JP 17316383 | [1985/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132415 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132415 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132415 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/12 | [1985/05] | CPC: |
G06K15/10 (EP,US);
G06K2215/111 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/05] | Title | German: | Drucksystem für einen Punktdrucker | [1985/05] | English: | Printing system for a dot printer | [1985/05] | French: | Système d'impression pour une imprimante de points | [1985/05] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2033844 (XEROX CORP); | [A]GB2105887 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [AP]US4431319 (KARAKI NOBUO [JP], et al) |