EP0140486 - Denture adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desmarais, Armand Joseph 3419 Pebble Beach Drive Fairway Falls Wilmington Delaware 19808 / US | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1985/19] | Application number, filing date | 84305209.3 | 31.07.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | US19830519331 | 01.08.1983 Original published format: US 519331 | [1985/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140486 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140486 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, C09J3/04, C09J3/16 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
A61K6/74 (EP);
A61K6/35 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/35, C08L1/28 (EP);
A61K6/35, C08L23/06 (EP);
A61K6/35, C08L33/08 (EP);
A61K6/35, C08L33/26 (EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Haftzusammensetzung für Zahnprothesen | [1985/19] | English: | Denture adhesive composition | [1985/19] | French: | Composition adhésive pour prothèses dentaires | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 03.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2978812 (ROSENTHAL MURRAY W, et al); | [A]US3440065 (VIA ANTHONY LAURENCE LA); | [A]DE3004161 (HERCULES INC); | [AD]US4304902 (LANDOLL LEO M) |