EP0137627 - Pour-on formulation for the control of parasites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PITMAN-MOORE AUSTRALIA LIMITED 71, Epping Road North Ryde New South Wales 2113 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states PITMAN-MOORE AUSTRALIA LIMITED 71, Epping Road North Ryde New South Wales 2113 / AU | ||
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states ICI AUSTRALIA LIMITED ICI House 1 Nicholson Street P.O.Box 4311 Melbourne Victoria 3001 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, David Alwyn Charles 9 Ballarat Street Collingwood Victoria, 3066 / AU | 02 /
Hamilton, Robert John 38 Steele Street Moonee Ponds Victoria, 3039 / AU | 03 /
Wilshire, Colin 17 Harry Street Doncaster East Victoria, 3109 / AU | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 9 The Parade Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 9 The Parade Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 5DG / GB | ||
Former [1985/16] | Atkinson, John David ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305443.8 | 09.08.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | AU19830000816 | 12.08.1983 Original published format: AU 81683 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0137627 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0137627 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137627 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/0017 (EP);
A01N25/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/16] | Title | German: | Aufgiessformulierung gegen Parasiten | [1985/16] | English: | Pour-on formulation for the control of parasites | [1985/16] | French: | Formulation pour application par versement pour lutter contre les parasites | [1985/16] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 29.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.1992 | BE | 22.01.1992 | CH | 22.01.1992 | LI | 22.01.1992 | SE | 22.01.1992 | LU | 31.08.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/46] | AT | 22.01.1992 | |
BE | 22.01.1992 | ||
CH | 22.01.1992 | ||
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | BE | 22.01.1992 | |
CH | 22.01.1992 | ||
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 22.01.1992 | |
LI | 22.01.1992 | ||
SE | 22.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 22.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2088212 (WELLCOME FOUND); | [X]GB2110090 (ICI AUSTRALIA LTD); | [X]GB2110091 (ICI AUSTRALIA LTD) |