EP0134140 - Method and equipment for making wire strands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDON plc Warmsworth Hall Doncaster South Yorkshire DN4 9JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | For all designated states BRIDON plc Warmsworth Hall Doncaster South Yorkshire DN4 9JX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christian, Philip 'Kismet' Station Road Norton Doncaster / GB | 02 /
Tawse, Alan Ian 32 High Street Hatfield Doncaster / GB | [1985/11] | Representative(s) | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305461.0 | 10.08.1984 | [1985/11] | Priority number, date | GB19830022441 | 19.08.1983 Original published format: GB 8322441 | [1985/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134140 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134140 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134140 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D07B3/00 | [1985/11] | CPC: |
B65H57/16 (EP,US);
B21F7/00 (KR);
D07B3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1989/40] |
Former [1985/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung von Drahtseilen | [1985/11] | English: | Method and equipment for making wire strands | [1985/11] | French: | Procédé et équipement pour la fabrication de câbles métalliques | [1985/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 17.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.1989 | BE | 04.10.1989 | CH | 04.10.1989 | IT | 04.10.1989 | LI | 04.10.1989 | NL | 04.10.1989 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.10.1989 | |
BE | 04.10.1989 | ||
CH | 04.10.1989 | ||
IT | 04.10.1989 | ||
LI | 04.10.1989 | ||
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 04.10.1989 | |
BE | 04.10.1989 | ||
CH | 04.10.1989 | ||
LI | 04.10.1989 | ||
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/40] | BE | 04.10.1989 | |
CH | 04.10.1989 | ||
LI | 04.10.1989 | ||
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | CH | 04.10.1989 | |
LI | 04.10.1989 | ||
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/18] | CH | 04.10.1989 | |
LI | 04.10.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR460208 (HEIN LEHMANN & C ACTIENGESELLSCHAFT EISENKONSTRUKT [DE]); | [A]FR683568 ; | [A]US3689982 (CAMPBELL IAN WALLACE); | [X]DE2261291 (WESTFAELISCHE UNION AG) |