EP0135365 - Regenerative-compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/13] | Regenerative turbomachine | ||
[1991/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOORE, Alan 4 Partickhill Avenue Glasgow G11 5AA Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states MOORE, Alan 4 Partickhill Avenue Glasgow G11 5AA Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1985/13] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Trade and Industry in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland 1/19 Victoria Street London SW1H OET / GB | ||
For all designated states MOORE, Alan 4 Partickhill Avenue Glasgow G11 5AA Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/10] |
Former [1985/13] | 01 /
Moore, Alan 4 Partickhill Avenue Glasgow G11 5AA Scotland / GB | Representative(s) | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | ||
Former [1986/34] | Pattullo, Norman Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | ||
Former [1985/13] | Wildman, David Brian British Aerospace Defence Limited Royal Ordnance Division Egyptian House 170-173 Piccadilly London W1V 9DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305541.9 | 15.08.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | GB19830022367 | 19.08.1983 Original published format: GB 8322367 | [1985/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135365 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135365 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135365 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F04D23/00 | [1985/13] | CPC: |
F04D23/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/13] | Title | German: | Seitenkanal-verdichter | [1991/42] | English: | Regenerative-compressor | [1991/42] | French: | Compresseur à canaux latéraux | [1991/42] |
Former [1985/13] | Seitenkanal-turbomaschine | ||
Former [1985/13] | Regenerative turbomachine | ||
Former [1985/13] | Turbomachine à canaux latéraux | Examination procedure | 08.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/42] | 12.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Request for further processing for: | 23.07.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.1991 | BE | 16.10.1991 | CH | 16.10.1991 | FR | 16.10.1991 | IT | 16.10.1991 | LI | 16.10.1991 | NL | 16.10.1991 | SE | 16.10.1991 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 16.10.1991 | |
BE | 16.10.1991 | ||
CH | 16.10.1991 | ||
IT | 16.10.1991 | ||
LI | 16.10.1991 | ||
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | AT | 16.10.1991 | |
BE | 16.10.1991 | ||
CH | 16.10.1991 | ||
LI | 16.10.1991 | ||
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/34] | AT | 16.10.1991 | |
CH | 16.10.1991 | ||
LI | 16.10.1991 | ||
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 16.10.1991 | |
CH | 16.10.1991 | ||
LI | 16.10.1991 | ||
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | CH | 16.10.1991 | |
LI | 16.10.1991 | ||
NL | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/21] | CH | 16.10.1991 | |
LI | 16.10.1991 | ||
SE | 16.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/16] | CH | 16.10.1991 | |
LI | 16.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR324837 (SCHEUBER GUSTAVE [FR]); | [X]DE915217 (GUSTAV FLUEGEL DR ING); | [X]US3138363 (GORDON BANERIAN); | [A]DE2258737 (ELEKTROR KARL W MUELLER ELEKTR); | [Y]US3869220 (TAYLER COLIN ANDREW MILLER); | [Y]US3951567 (ROHS ULRICH); | [A]EP0036714 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) |