EP0173776 - A puzzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1986 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.1986 [1986/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewett, Erskine 14 Durham Street Brooklyn Wellington / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states Hewett, Erskine 14 Durham Street Brooklyn Wellington / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305712.6 | 22.08.1984 | [1986/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173776 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/12 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
A63F9/1204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/11] | Title | German: | Geduldspiel | [1986/11] | English: | A puzzle | [1986/11] | French: | Puzzle | [1986/11] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1339251 ; | [X]US4307886 |