EP0136827 - Control system for cigarette wrapping and packaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states THE JAPAN TOBACCO & SALT PUBLIC CORPORATION 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Norimasa 1-17-402, Takinogawa 4 Chome Kita-Ku Tokyo 114 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Yoshihisa 1-304, Asahicho 4 Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Evershed, Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [1985/15] | Application number, filing date | 84305985.8 | 31.08.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | JP19830160253 | 02.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16025383 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136827 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136827 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136827 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/35 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
A24C5/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1985/15] | Title | German: | Kontrollanlage für eine Herstellungs- und Verpackungsvorrichtung von Zigaretten | [1985/15] | English: | Control system for cigarette wrapping and packaging system | [1985/15] | French: | Système de contrôle pour un dispositif de fabrication et d'empaquetage de cigarettes | [1985/15] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/21] | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Request for further processing for: | 24.07.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2379437 (LIGGETT GROUP INC [US]); | [A]DE2520222 (SCHMERMUND MASCHF ALFRED); | [A]US4361759 (KING GEORGE W, et al); | [A]FR2349288 (SCHMERMUND MASCHF ALFRED [DE]); | [A]GB1602449 (MOLINS LTD); | [A]DE2505622 (FORENEDE BRYGGERIER AS) | Examination | JPS51133500 |