EP0135389 - Integral track vehicle seat apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Marmon Corporation 39 South LaSalle Street Chicago, Illinois / US | [1988/19] |
Former [1985/13] | For all designated states AMERICAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 1400 Rankin Street Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayden, Richard 5128 Prentis Troy Michigan 48084 / US | 02 /
Neumann, Fred F. 909 Langley Drive Rochester Michigan 48098 / US | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | ||
Former [1988/19] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | ||
Former [1985/13] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306195.3 | 11.09.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | US19830534332 | 21.09.1983 Original published format: US 534332 | [1985/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135389 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135389 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60N1/08 | [1985/13] | CPC: |
B60N2/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/13] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitzeinheit mit eingebauter Gleitschiene | [1985/13] | English: | Integral track vehicle seat apparatus | [1985/13] | French: | Ensemble de siège de véhicule à glissière intégrée | [1985/13] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 22.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/14] | 21.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3030725 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB [DE]); | [X]US2285616 (SAUNDERS WALTER S, et al); | [X]US4159847 (ARAI TOMIJI); | [X]FR2406537 (WHITEHEAD MOTO FIDES STABIL [IT]); | [A]FR2525975 (SESSA T [IT]); | [A]DE2828164 (CHAPMAN LTD A W); | [A]US3841696 (WAGNER R); | [A]GB1546166 (CHAPMAN LTD A); | [AP]GB2108836 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB); | [AP]DE3238593 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB [DE]) |