EP0138442 - Envelope feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tam, Alexander 1282 Mattox Road Apt.40 Hayward California 94541 / US | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306517.8 | 25.09.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | US19830536043 | 26.09.1983 Original published format: US 536043 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138442 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/06 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
B65H3/063 (EP,US);
B65H1/12 (EP,US);
B65H3/56 (EP,US);
B65H2402/46 (EP,US);
B65H2511/12 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/12, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/17] | Title | German: | Zuführeinrichtung für Briefumschläge | [1985/24] | English: | Envelope feeder | [1985/17] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation pour enveloppes | [1985/24] | File destroyed: | 28.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/50] | 14.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/25] | 16.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1936535 [ ] (SPERRY RAND CORP); | US3539179 [ ] (BERGMAN CHARLES T, et al) |