Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0138442 | Global Dossier | 24.04.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53604383 | 26.09.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1223286 | 23.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US53604383 | 26.09.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6087144 | 16.05.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US53604383 | 26.09.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4585223 | 29.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US53604383 | 26.09.1983 |