EP0176635 - A device and apparatus for use in conjunction with tickets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONDON REGIONAL TRANSPORT 55 Broadway London SW1H 0BD / GB | [1986/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tansley, Robert 1 Chapel Street Harbury Warwickshire / GB | 02 /
McManus, Kevin 12 Waller Street Leamington Spa Warwickshire / GB | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Newens, Leonard Eric, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & CO. 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Newens, Leonard Eric, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & CO. 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306548.3 | 26.09.1984 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176635 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06K1/12, G07B1/00 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
G07B1/00 (EP);
G06K1/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Apparat für den Gebrauch im Zusammenhang mit Tickets | [1986/15] | English: | A device and apparatus for use in conjunction with tickets | [1986/15] | French: | Dispositif et appareil d'utilisation relatifs à des tickets | [1986/15] | File destroyed: | 28.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/27] | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR94266E [ ]; | US3820456 [ ]; | FR2084831 [ ]; | GB2077663 [ ]; | FR2379121 [ ]; | US4192618 [ ]; | FR1591768 [ ] |