EP0141532 - A hair brush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.1989 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 28.06.1989 [1989/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENROY PLASTICS LIMITED Clandeboye Road Bangor County Down Northern Ireland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states DENROY PLASTICS LIMITED Clandeboye Road Bangor County Down Northern Ireland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steadman, Alan E. 85 Brighton Road Surbiton Surrey KT6 5NX / GB | 02 /
Burridge, Christopher A. 85 Brighton Road Surbiton Surrey KT6 5NX / GB | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Sorrell, Terence Gordon, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Sorrell, Terence Gordon, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1986/46] | Arthur, John William FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1985/20] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306694.5 | 01.10.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | GB19830026379 | 01.10.1983 Original published format: GB 8326379 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141532 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141532 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/00, A46B5/02, A46B9/02, A46B15/00, A46B1/00, A46D1/00 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
A46B15/0051 (EP);
A46B1/00 (EP);
A46B15/00 (EP);
A46B5/00 (EP);
A46B5/02 (EP);
A46B9/023 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] |
Former [1985/20] | IT | Title | German: | Haarbürste | [1985/20] | English: | A hair brush | [1985/20] | French: | Brosse à cheveux | [1985/20] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1986/52: Verbunden mit 84903648.8/0141532 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 10.09.86 | EPB 1986/52: Consolidated with 84903648.8/0141532 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 10.09.86 | EPB 1986/52: Jointe à la demande no. 84903648.8/0141532 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 10.09.86 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 07.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/08] | Request for further processing for: | 16.06.1987 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.1988 | BE | 02.03.1988 | CH | 02.03.1988 | LI | 02.03.1988 | SE | 31.03.1988 | [1989/26] |
Former [1989/21] | AT | 02.03.1988 | |
BE | 02.03.1988 | ||
SE | 31.03.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 02.03.1988 | |
BE | 02.03.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 02.03.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5371971 ; | [A]US2633591 (SERVILLA WILLIAM J); | [A]US2827060 (MARTY ARTHUR A); | [A]US2889567 (SOLOMON NATHAN L); | [A]US3253292 (HERSCHENSOHN ARTHUR M); | [A]US4030158 (BLAIR MICHAEL A, et al); | [X]US4076032 (MISERCOLA DOUGLAS); | [A]FR2368915 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [XP]GB2118029 (OREAL) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 103, 24th August 1978, page 3156 M 78; & JP - A - 53 71 971 (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.)(26-06-1978), & JP5371971 A 00000000 |