Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
09.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] |
25.01.1988 | First examination report | |
30.01.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] |
21.10.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.1985 [1985/52] |
02.04.1985 | Change - German title | published on 05.06.1985 [1985/23] |
02.04.1985 | Change - French title | published on 05.06.1985 [1985/23] |
09.02.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] |