EP0136916 - Anthithrombic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Kouichi c/o Itama Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hygo / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Ideo c/o Itama Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hygo / JP | 03 /
Isomura, Akihiko c/o Kumatori Works Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd. 950 Noda Kumatori-cho Sennan-gun Osaka / JP | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306745.5 | 03.10.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | JP19830185599 | 03.10.1983 Original published format: JP 18559983 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136916 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136916 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136916 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61L33/00, C08L23/18, C08L23/16, C08L5/08, C08L5/04, C08L23/22, C08L67/04, // (C08L23/16, 5:08) | [1985/15] | CPC: |
A61L33/062 (EP,US);
A61L33/0011 (EP,US);
A61L33/0041 (EP,US);
A61L33/0047 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L33/062, C08L5/04, C08L101/00 (EP,US);
A61L33/062, C08L5/10 (US,EP);
C08L101/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/15] | Title | German: | Antithrombogene Harzmischung | [1985/25] | English: | Anthithrombic resin composition | [1985/15] | French: | Composition de résine antithrombogène | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/14] | 03.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2142277 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]DE2812174 (SNAM PROGETTI) |